OR SB628 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates portion of U.S. Highway 395, known as Pendleton-John Day Highway, as Don Kendall Memorial Highway.
Title
Relating to U.S. Highway 395.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2016. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 095, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-05-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Keny-Guyer, McLane, Weidner. |
2015-05-13 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 14, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-12 | House | Second reading. |
2015-05-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-03-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |