OR SB611 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, July 6, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, July 6, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Caps annual rent increases for residential tenancies. Limits] Caps annual rent increases for residential tenancies. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to residential tenancies; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Senate | Effective date, July 6, 2023. |
2023-07-21 | Senate | Chapter 226, 2023 Laws. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Valderrama. Passed. Ayes, 32; Nays, 18--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Cramer, Gomberg, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Osborne, Scharf, Stout, Tran, Wallan; Excused, 10--Conrad, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Morgan, Nguyen H, Owens, Reschke, Smith G, Wright. |
2023-06-23 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-06-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-06-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Girod declared potential conflict of interest. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 8--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng). |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |