OR SB575 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies procedure for expunction of certain juvenile records. Modifies procedure for expunction of certain juvenile records. Directs juvenile department to initiate statutory expunction process for juvenile records relating to contact that did not result in referral to juvenile court. Directs juvenile department to apply for expunction of juvenile records if juvenile had contact with juvenile department but was never found to be under jurisdiction of juvenile court. Changes punishment for releasing all or part of expunged record from misdemeanor to violation punishable by maximum of $2,000 fine. Modifies process for access to counsel for persons seeking to file application for expunction of juvenile records. Directs Oregon Youth Authority, in collaboration with county juvenile departments and Judicial Department, to submit report and recommendations for legislation regarding juvenile expunction process to interim committees of Legislative Assembly relating to juveniles. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to juvenile records; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Sen. Katherine Lieber [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] |
Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 585, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 1--Hayden; Excused, 3--Dexter, Smith G, Wilde; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Morgan. |
2021-06-25 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Findley, Girod, Heard; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |