OR SB5711 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - President signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys from General Fund to specified state agencies for certain biennial expenses. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to _____ for biennial expenses.] Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by _______.] Limits biennial expenditures of _____ from federal funds.] Modifies certain biennial appropriations made from General Fund to Emergency Board and specified state agencies. Establishes and modifies limitations on expenditures for certain biennial expenses for specified state agencies. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-06-26HouseReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-06-26SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 1--Boquist; Excused, 4--Boles, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2020-06-25SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-06-24SenateReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-24SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback