OR SB5517 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Effective date, July 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Effective date, July 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for State School Fund. Limits biennial expenditures from lottery moneys allocated from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to department for State School Fund. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department for State School Fund. Specifies amounts department may spend for certain purposes from State School Fund. Specifies, for 2017 and 2018 fiscal years, total amount that department may spend from State School Fund. Transfers moneys from State School Fund to Local Option Equalization Grants Account. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Effective date, July 6, 2017. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Chapter 564, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-27 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith Db, Sollman, Wilson. |
2017-06-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed.Ayes, 31; Nays, 28--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Fahey, Hack, Heard, Hernandez, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Sanchez, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Hayden. |
2017-06-20 | House | Third Reading. Postponed to Tuesday, June 27, 2017 Calendar.Ayes, 35; Nays, 24--Barreto, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Bentz. |
2017-06-19 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Vote explanations filed by Monnes Anderson, Prozanski, Taylor. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Boquist, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Prozanski, Taylor granted unanimous consent to change vote from nay to aye. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |