OR SB530 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs certain health professional regulatory boards to adopt rules by January 1, 2016, requiring licensees to document participation in continuing education opportunities relating to cultural competency approved by Oregon Health Authority.
Title
Relating to continuing education for health care professionals; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |