OR SB524 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - At President's desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - At President's desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to convene advisory council to consider policy implications of identifying specific crimes for which conviction is disqualifying conviction for individuals seeking licensure or registration from Teacher Standards and Practices Commission or seeking employment or contract with school district. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to convene advisory council to consider policy implications of identifying specific crimes for which conviction is disqualifying conviction for individuals seeking licensure or registration from Teacher Standards and Practices Commission or seeking employment or contract with school district. Requires Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to education and judiciary not later than September 15, 2024. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to disqualifying convictions for schools; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Sen. Kayse Jama [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] |
Sen. James Manning [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | At President's desk upon adjournment. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |