OR SB523 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes community colleges to offer Bachelor of Science in nursing degrees. Authorizes community colleges to offer Bachelor of Science in nursing degrees. Details requirements that must be met for Higher Education Coordinating Commission to approve community college request to offer Bachelor of Science in nursing degree program.
Title
Relating to degree programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2024. |
2023-07-21 | Senate | Chapter 287, 2023 Laws. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 22; Absent, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 1--Girod. |
2023-05-25 | House | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Boshart Davis, Evans, Holvey, Javadi, Scharf, Sosa. |
2023-05-24 | House | Rules Suspended, taken from 05-24 Calendar and placed on Consent Calendar for 05-25. |
2023-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2023-05-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-11 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2023-04-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred to Higher Education. |
2023-04-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow, Girod. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Findley, Gorsek. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |