OR SB520 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 525, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 525, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that recall petition of district officer of irrigation district be filed with members of board of directors of irrigation district who are not subject to recall petition. Requires that recall petition of district officer of irrigation district be filed with members of board of directors of irrigation district who are not subject to recall petition.
Title
Relating to recall of district officers of irrigation districts.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 525, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Bentz, Boone. |
2017-06-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 21, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-19 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-13 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-03-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |