OR SB501 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Effective date, August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Effective date, August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Capital Construction Budget Process. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Youth Authority for East Metro Gang Enforcement Team gang intervention services in east Multnomah County.] Modifies amount transferred to Legislative Fiscal Office Operating Fund. Modifies applicability date for laws relating to legislator salaries. Transfers moneys from Secretary of State Operating Account to General Fund. Specifies that amounts distributed from Oregon Liquor Control Commission Account that are attributable to per bottle surcharge are credited to General Fund. Transfers moneys from Supplemental Employment Department Administration Fund to General Fund. Modifies Department of Education Farm-to-School Grant Program. Allocates Department of Transportation moneys for specific road construction projects. Transfers moneys from Public Employees' Revolving Fund to General Fund. Allows Department of Human Services to make payments to guardians in addition to adoptive parents. Modifies repeal date for State Department of Fish and Wildlife study. Allows counties to use up to one-half of moneys distributed for law libraries by Judicial Department for providing conciliation and mediation services. Transfers balance of Connecting Oregon Communities Fund to General Fund. Specifies that if amount of declared earnings from Education Stability Fund deposited in Oregon Education Fund exceeds amount needed to pay for education lottery bond debt service, amount of excess earnings is transferred to Higher Education Coordinating Commission for Oregon Opportunity Grant program. Allows moneys in State Library Donation Fund to be invested. Directs Legislative Counsel and Legislative Fiscal Office to review state law governing investment by State Treasurer of funds of state, local governments and tribal governments. Provides cost of living adjustment for judges based on cost of living adjustment granted to employees in management service in executive department. Clarifies law on reversion of unspent lottery allocations. Directs public university that increases resident undergraduate tuition or mandatory enrollment fees by more than three percent for 2016-2017 academic year to report justification for increase to Higher Education Coordinating Commission and Joint Committee on Ways and Means. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015] on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Senate | Effective date, August 12, 2015. |
2015-08-13 | Senate | Chapter 840, 2015 Laws. |
2015-08-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed.Ayes, 42; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Buehler, Gallegos. |
2015-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2015-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-07-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-07-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Girod granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to Ways and Means to adopt the -A3 challenged by Rosenbaum. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood, then Ways and Means. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |