OR SB479 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: Senate Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires public employers to adopt policies to prevent workplace harassment. Requires public employers to establish policies and procedures for addressing reports of workplace harassment. Requires employer to follow up with victim of reported harassment to determine whether harassment has stopped or if victim has experienced retaliation. Prohibits use of public funds to pay for person's silence or inaction related to allegation or investigation of workplace harassment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to workplace harassment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-24SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Workforce.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback