OR SB471 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Department of Agriculture for deposit in Wolf Management Compensation and Proactive Trust Fund. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Department of Agriculture for deposit in Wolf Management Compensation and Proactive Trust Fund. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to appropriations for livestock loss; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |