OR SB401 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits mining using motorized equipment in scenic waterways.
Title
Relating to scenic waterways; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Bates [D] | Sen. Mark Hass [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |