OR SB375 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Stroke Care Committee in Oregon Health Authority.
Title
Relating to health care.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Bates [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 339, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-05-31 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2013-05-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-20 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-15 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2013-04-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Ferrioli, Steiner Hayward. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |