OR SB347 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies crime applicable to possession of firearm, or instrument used as dangerous weapon, while in or on school grounds.
Title
Relating to weapons on school grounds; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |