OR SB277 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Teacher Standards and Practices Commission to conduct study to identify methods to address workforce shortages in kindergarten through grade 12. Requires Teacher Standards and Practices Commission to conduct study to identify methods to address workforce shortages in kindergarten through grade 12. Directs commission to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to early childhood not later than September 15, 2024.
Title
Relating to the kindergarten through grade 12 workforce.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |