OR SB265 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Human Services to ensure that staff working in residential programs that serve children placed there by public entities receive training in nonviolent crisis intervention. Requires Department of Human Services to study and make recommendations to interim committees of Legislative Assembly, no later than September 15, 2022, for legislative changes needed to improve care of residents and training of staff in residential programs.] Directs Department of Human Services to ensure that staff working in residential programs that serve children placed there by public entities receive training in nonviolent crisis intervention. Provides stipends and travel reimbursement to trainees. Specifies requirements for trainings. Directs department to submit reports to Legislative Assembly about trainings. Sunsets January 2] June 30, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to residential programs; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |