OR SB226 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to convene advisory group to study media program standards developed by State Board of Education and to report results of study to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education. Directs Department of Education to conduct study on education system of state and to report results of study to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education.] Sunsets December 31, 2021.] Directs Department of Education to convene advisory group to study media program standards developed by State Board of Education and to report results of study to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education. Sunsets on December 31, 2021. Requires State Board of Education to consult with State Library when establishing standards involving media programs, including information literacy. Directs State Board of Education to have eligibility requirements for recognizing high school graduates who have attained high level of proficiency in reading, writing, listening and speaking in one or more world languages. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |