OR SB1562 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Effective date, March 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Effective date, March 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements for health insurance coverage of services, medications and supplies necessary for management of diabetes during pregnancy. Requires executive director of Oregon Health Insurance Exchange Corporation to compile and make publicly available reports or findings resulting from independent review, investigation or audit of health insurance exchange. Requires executive director to appear before interim House and Senate committees related to health at first meeting of committees following adjournment sine die, to present updated business plan for exchange containing specified information. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health insurance; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Effective date, March 13, 2014. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Chapter 74, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick, Conger. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hicks, Lively. |
2014-02-25 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |