OR SB131 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds supervisors of youth correction facilities and juvenile community supervision officers to list of professionals required to make notification of death and cooperate in investigation of death by providing records and other materials. Adds supervisors of youth correction facilities and juvenile community supervision officers to list of professionals required to make notification of death and cooperate in investigation of death by providing records and other materials. Requires cooperation with both medical examiner and medical-legal death investigator.
Title
Relating to investigations of deaths.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 321, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Clem, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-25 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 11--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |