OR SB110 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals sunset on early discussion and resolution program for resolving adverse health care incidents. Repeals sunset on early discussion and resolution program for resolving adverse health care incidents.
Title
Relating to resolving adverse health care events.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 271, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 2--Clem, Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Drazan, Holvey, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-25 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |