OR SB1036 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date, March 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date, March 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to guest ranches; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to guest ranches; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Effective date, March 18, 2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Chapter 84, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-18 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 30. | |
2010-02-22 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bentz. | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Schaufler. | |
2010-02-19 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-18 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-18 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-16 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Agriculture, Natural Resources and Rural Communities. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters. | |
2010-02-11 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |