OR SB1023 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "victim" for purposes of release of sex offender information by Department of State Police. Defines "victim" for purposes of release of sex offender information by Department of State Police.
Title
Relating to sex offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Meek, Prozanski, Sollman. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Judiciary failed. Ayes, 12; Nays, 16--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Hansell. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |