OR HJR25 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution requiring House of Representatives to be elected by closed-list proportional representation. Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution requiring House of Representatives to be elected by closed-list proportional representation. Applies to elections for members of House of Representatives held on or after November 3, 2026. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to proportional representation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |