OR HCR28 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes and honors Sergeant First Class Scot R. Noss for his service to his country.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing and honoring Sergeant First Class Scot R. Noss for his service to his country.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseFiled with Secretary of State.
2019-05-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-05-22HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-05-21SenateFinal reading. Carried by Girod. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Knopp, Olsen, Winters.
2019-05-20SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-20SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-05-15SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-05-08SenatePossible Work Session cancelled.
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-04-11SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-10HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Sprenger. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, Boshart Davis.
2019-04-10HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 10, 2019 Calendar.
2019-04-09HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-04-04HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback