OR HCR17 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Referred to Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

In memoriam: Alter Wiener, 1926-2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memoriam: Alter Wiener.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Education.
2019-03-14SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-03-12HouseRead. Carried by Sollman. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Keny-Guyer.
2019-03-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 12, 2019 Calendar.
2019-03-05HouseRecommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-02-06HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback