OR HB4148 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of State Lands, in consultation with State Department of Fish and Wildlife, to establish salmon credit program to encourage voluntary restoration of salmonid habitat and allow persons to meet compensatory mitigation obligations. Directs Department of State Lands, in consultation with State Department of Fish and Wildlife, to establish salmon credit program to encourage voluntary restoration of salmonid habitat and allow persons to meet compensatory mitigation obligations. Establishes Salmon Credit Trust Fund. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to salmonid habitat restoration; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2022R1/Measures/Overview/HB4148 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2022R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4148/Introduced |