OR HB4132 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Authority to administer and collect data from student health surveys. Requires authority to consult with Department of Education to convene student health survey planning committee, to engage adolescents in creating and revising surveys and interpreting survey data and to use survey data to assess implementation of laws and rules related to students' health, safety and well-being. Modifies definition of "adolescent" for purposes of surveys. Requires authority to provide process to inform adolescents and their parents or guardians that participation in survey is voluntary, to develop plan to distribute survey data and to biennially report on surveys to interim committee related to education. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to student health surveys; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-10HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback