OR HB4114 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 39, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 39, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes court to appoint protected person special advocate in protective proceeding at any time after appointment of fiduciary that is not financial institution or trust company. Authorizes court to appoint protected person special advocate in protective proceeding at any time after appointment of fiduciary that is not financial institution or trust company. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to special advocates for protected persons; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 39, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014. |
2014-03-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 60. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Starr. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gallegos, Gilliam. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Conger, Hanna, Richardson. |
2014-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |