OR HB4106 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from property taxation real and personal property of history museum, natural history museum or science museum that is land on which museum is situated or that is used in conjunction with public displays, used to educate public, used to sell goods related to displays or educational purpose of museum, used to sell goods and services providing refreshment to public while visiting museum or used as theater for presentations about history or science. Denies exemption if real or personal property used in sales of goods or services is leased to for-profit entity. Provides that history museum, natural history museum or science museum may not be deprived of exemption solely because primary funding is from governmental entities. Applies to property tax years beginning on or after July 1, 2014. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to property tax exemption for museums; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Weidner [R] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] | Rep. Vicki Berger [R] |
Rep. Tim Freeman [R] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4106 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4106/Introduced |