OR HB3640 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Chapter 69, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Chapter 69, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to cancellation of ad valorem tax assessment of personal property; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to cancellation of ad valorem tax assessment of personal property; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Chapter 69, (2010 Laws): Effective date May 27, 2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-24 | President signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-20 | Verger declared potential conflict of interest. | |
2010-02-20 | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Girod; excused, 1--Nelson. | |
2010-02-19 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to Finance and Revenue. | |
2010-02-11 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Hunt. | |
2010-02-09 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Revenue. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |