OR HB3627 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for State School Fund. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for State School Fund. Limits biennial expenditures from lottery moneys allocated to department for State School Fund. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department for State School Fund. Specifies amounts department may spend for certain purposes from State School Fund. Transfers moneys from State School Fund to Local Option Equalization Grants Account. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to the state financial administration of the Department of Education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-05-23 | House | Motion to withdraw from Rules failed. Ayes, 30; Nays, 29--Andersen, Bowman, Bynum, Chaichi, Dexter, Fahey, Gamba, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield; Excused, 1--Evans. |
2023-05-22 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-05-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |