OR HB3520 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Oregon resident filing for bankruptcy to claim either exemptions established by federal law or exemptions established by state law.
Title
Relating to bankruptcy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-05-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Bentz, Freeman, Hanna, Huffman, Johnson, Krieger, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger; Excused, 1--Fagan. |
2013-05-14 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-05-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-05-01 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-04-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |