OR HB3253 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals operative date provision for law allowing Governor to enter into agreement with another state for cross-jurisdictional coordination and delivery of marijuana items. Repeals operative date provision for law allowing Governor to enter into agreement with another state for cross-jurisdictional coordination and delivery of marijuana items.
Title
Relating to marijuana.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to General Government with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3253 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3253/Introduced |