OR HB3197 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires marijuana testing laboratory employee to obtain worker permit from Oregon Liquor Control Commission. Requires marijuana testing laboratory employee to obtain worker permit from Oregon Liquor Control Commission. Defines "premises" for purposes of marijuana testing laboratories. Allows applicant for worker permit who successfully passes permit examination to temporarily perform work for licensee or laboratory prior to receiving worker permit. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to establish by rule process to register medical marijuana grow sites. Defines "medical marijuana grow site." Allows medical marijuana grow sites to apply for registration no later than June 1, 2022. Establishes plant production limits for medical marijuana grow sites registered by commission. Specifies that marijuana grow sites registered by Oregon Health Authority may produce marijuana for no more than two registry identification cardholders.] Allows authority to specify marijuana item testing batch size up to 50 pounds.] Allows commission to allow certain licensed marijuana retailers to relocate to other premises without obtaining new license. Allows marijuana processor to transfer, sell or transport specified industrial hemp commodity or product to person that is not licensed by commission. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Becomes operative January 1, 2022.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to cannabis; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to General Government with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |