OR HB2986 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 246, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 246, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Board on Public Safety Standards and Training to ensure that police officers and certified reserve officers are trained to investigate, identify and report crimes motivated by prejudice based on perceived gender of victim. Requires Board on Public Safety Standards and Training to ensure that police officers and certified reserve officers are trained to investigate, identify and report crimes motivated by prejudice based on perceived gender of victim.
Title
Relating to training of officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 246, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Leif, Nearman. |
2021-04-20 | House | Carried over to April 26, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 04-20 Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-15 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-03-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Equitable Policing. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |