OR HB2899 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allocates lottery moneys to further economic development by assisting veterans to apply for federal and state veterans' benefits and aid. Establishes Veterans' Benefit Economic Development Fund and continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Department of Veterans' Affairs for purposes of Act. Sunsets June 30, 2025.
Title
Relating to veterans' benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Deborah Boone [D] | Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. John Huffman [R] |
Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2015-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2899 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2899/Introduced |