OR HB2892 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to boundary by agreement.
Title
Relating to boundary by agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-04-26 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-25 | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. | |
2011-04-21 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-20 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-18 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-04-12 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-23 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |