OR HB2860 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts number of personnel files concerning faculty members that community college may maintain. Provides that faculty member may respond to information in personnel files. Prohibits community college or public university from basing evaluation of faculty member on information from personnel files other than authorized personnel files. Permits faculty member to bring action for damages or other equitable relief against community college or individuals who participate in evaluation in violation of prohibition. Becomes operative January 1, 2018.
Title
Relating to personnel files kept for faculty members at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-02-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2860 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2860/Introduced |