OR HB2703 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 161, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 161, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that real estate continuing education courses include information on state and federal fair housing laws. Requires that real estate continuing education courses include information on state and federal fair housing laws. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to real estate continuing education courses; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Rep. Vikki Breese-Iverson [R] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Boomer Wright [R] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 161, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 5--Anderson, Findley, Hansell, President Courtney, Thatcher. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 44; Excused, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Grayber, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Wilde, Williams, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |