OR HB2657 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Youth Development Council to develop statewide plan to provide out-of-school youth with opportunities to become reengaged and to succeed in education or workforce. Establishes Task Force on Youth Reengagement for purpose of providing input on development of plan. Requires task force to submit report to interim legislative committees related to education no later than September 15, 2018. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to out-of-school youth; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-03-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-03-22 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |