OR HB2646 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Vetoed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes regulations for kratom products, including testing standards, labeling requirements and minimum age for sale. Establishes regulations for kratom products, including testing standards, labeling requirements and minimum age for sale. Prohibits sale of kratom products unless kratom product derives from processor registered with State Department of Agriculture. Directs department to adopt rules to carry out regulations. Authorizes imposition of civil penalty for certain violations. Creates crime of unlawful distribution, sale or exposure for sale to individual under 21 years of age. Punishes by maximum of 30 days' imprisonment, $1,250 fine, or both. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Department of Agriculture for carrying out provisions of Act. Increases limitation on expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Department of Justice for carrying out provisions of Act. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to kratom; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-06HouseGovernor vetoed.
2021-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Robinson; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr.
2021-06-26SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2021-06-25SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-25SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-24HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Post. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused, 1--Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 9--Bynum, Drazan, Gomberg, Leif, McLain, Nosse, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-24HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-06-21HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-17HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-17HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-14HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2021-04-08HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2021-04-08HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2021-04-06HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-11HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-04HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to General Government.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2646
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2646/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2646/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2646/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2646/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2646/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2646/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31821
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33106
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533684
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=534685

Bill Comments

feedback