OR HB2643 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts to develop, review and revise individualized suicide prevention protection plan for each youth who demonstrates suicidal behavior. Requires school districts to develop, review and revise individualized suicide prevention protection plan for each youth who demonstrates suicidal behavior. Requires State Board of Education, in consultation with Oregon Health Authority, to adopt rules for school districts to implement individualized suicide prevention protection plans and adopt standard form for use in developing for youth individualized suicide prevention protection plan. Requires Department of Education and Oregon Health Authority to maintain record of all individualized suicide prevention protection plans developed. Requires school district's plan on student suicide prevention to include training for all school employees in preventing suicide. Directs Oregon Health and Science University to convene work group to examine ways to improve individualized suicide prevention protection plans and manage disruptive classroom environments during a behavioral or mental health crisis. Directs university to submit report on work group's findings and recommendations to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to education and human services no later than September 15, 2024.
Title
Relating to suicide prevention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Education. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |