OR HB2601 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chapter 17, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chapter 17, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes nonsubstantive and technical changes in Oregon law. Corrects grammar and punctuation. Deletes obsolete provisions. Conforms language to existing statutes and legislative style.
Title
Relating to correction of erroneous material in Oregon law.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Chapter 17, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-04-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Power, Williamson. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr, Linthicum. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Thomsen; excused, 1--Hass. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-02-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |