OR HB2572 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Vote explanation(s) filed by Conrad, Mannix.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates right of action for person injured by paramilitary activity. Expands definition of "civil disorder" for purposes of crime of unlawful paramilitary activity.] Creates right of action for person injured by paramilitary activity. Authorizes Attorney General to bring civil action for injunctive relief against paramilitary activity and authorizes use by Attorney General of investigative demands during investigation into paramilitary activity. Specifies exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to paramilitary activity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-17HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Conrad, Mannix.
2023-05-17HouseThird reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Chaichi, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Smith G, Stout, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 1--Lively.
2023-05-16HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2023-05-11HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-28HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2023-03-28HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
2023-03-20HouseWork Session held.
2023-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2572
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2572/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2572/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2572/A-Engrossed
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22493
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23206
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23306
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24699
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24864
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76120
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/65538
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76098
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76613
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/260420
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/260134
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265594
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265803
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265804
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272407
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272718
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273275
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79355
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273666
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79362
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79496
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79556
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34652
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35769
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=580230

Bill Comments

feedback