OR HB2569 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Human Services and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Human Services to assign exactly one universal provider number to persons listed on registry of persons who provide long term care. Directs department to require fingerprints in conducting criminal records checks of certain long term care workers. Disallows sharing of fingerprint records of certain long term care workers with Federal Bureau of Investigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to records checks for long term care workers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-06HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback