OR HB2534 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 67, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 67, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires homeowners associations and condominium associations to review governing documents and remove discriminatory language or certify the nonexistence of such language on or before December 31, 2022. Requires homeowners associations and condominium associations to review governing documents and remove discriminatory language or certify the nonexistence of such language on or before December 31, 2023] 2022. Provides a cause of action for enforcement. Sunsets January 2, 2026.] Makes certain discriminatory language in governing documents void and unenforceable. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to removal of discriminatory restrictions in governing documents; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] |
Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Sen. Deb Patterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 67, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Heard, Robinson; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Manning Jr. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused, 11--Bonham, Bynum, Clem, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |