OR HB2500 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that mileage reimbursement be paid to home care workers, personal support workers and personal care workers who provide home care services to clients who live in remote locations. Requires that mileage reimbursement be paid to home care workers, personal support workers and other direct support professionals who commute more than 15 miles each way to client's residence] personal care workers who provide home care services to clients who live in remote locations. Requires Oregon Health Authority to establish process for in-home care agencies to request approval to provide training required by law to agency's own employees and contractors. Specifies criteria for approval of requests.
Title
Relating to in-home care providers.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Anna Scharf [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |