OR HB2461 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 205, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 205, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Department of State Lands by rule to provide for additional exemptions to leasing requirements relating to submersible lands. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to exemption from leasing requirements for submersible lands; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Chapter 205, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015. |
2015-06-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Baertschiger Jr; excused, 1--Burdick. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-02-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Post. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Kennemer. |
2015-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2015-02-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use and Water. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |