OR HB2460 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-01 - Chapter 707, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-01 - Chapter 707, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Department of Revenue to report to Legislative Assembly on use of out-of-state tax shelters and make recommendations for addressing noncompliance attributable to out-of-state tax shelters.
Title
Relating to tax compliance; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-01 | House | Chapter 707, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013. |
2013-08-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barker, Smith. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by George. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Girod, Johnson. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 3--Buckley, Gorsek, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Barker, Garrett, Gelser. |
2013-05-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-20 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-05-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |